+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 329: yeas 42, nays 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Representative Lawson added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 93, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative Frizzell added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 48, nays 0
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Steele added as second author
- Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
- Authored by Senator Young R Michael
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor