+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Brown, T.
- House sponsor: Representative Zent
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 101: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Randolph, Stoops, Charbonneau, Houchin added as coauthors
- Senator Tallian added as third author
- Senator Walker added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Buck
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor