+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Washburne
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 33: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Zay added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
- Authored by Senator Messmer
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor