+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added as coauthor
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as coauthor
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as third author
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
- Authored by Senators Ruckelshaus and Bohacek