+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Cook
- House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 38, nays 11
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Ruckelshaus) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Lanane added as coauthor
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as third author
- Senator Doriot added as second author
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
- Authored by Senator Ruckelshaus
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor