+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Wolkins added sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 103: yeas 44 and nays 4
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- SB 156 Amendment #1 (Head), prevailed.
- SB 156 Amendment #4 (Head), prevailed.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Broden removed as second author.
- Senator Buck added as second author.
- Senator Broden added as coauthor.
- Committee report; amend do pass; adopted
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Broden added as second author.
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Head
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor