+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Law 207
- Signed by the Governor
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 471: yeas 28, nays 17
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 374: yeas 97, nays 0
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Ziemke added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Lawson added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Frizzell
- House sponsor: Representative Olthoff
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 34, nays 16
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Merritt) prevailed; voice vote
- Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed back on second reading
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as third author
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as second author
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
- Authored by Senator Merritt