+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Charbonneau, Glick, Kruse added as coauthors
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Alting added as second author
- Cosponsor: Representative Frye
- House sponsor: Representative Cherry
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Merritt, Sandlin, Doriot, Ford, Niezgodski, Melton added as coauthors
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
- Authored by Senator Crider
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor