+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Law 90
- Signed by the Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 92, nays 0
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Macer added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kenley added as coauthor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 50, nays 0
- House sponsor: Representative Cox
- Cosponsors: Representatives Judy and Frye
- Senator Smith added as coauthor
- Senator Young, M. added as coauthor
- Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
- Senator Tomes added as coauthor
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Ford and Merritt added as coauthors
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Arnold added as coauthor
- Senator Houchin added as third author
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added as coauthor
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military
- Authored by Senators Banks and Mishler
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor