+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Thompson and Smith, V.
- House sponsor: Representative Clere
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 48, nays 1
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as second author
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senator Leising