+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker added as coauthor
- Representative Bacon added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Becker added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Tomes