+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Barrett and Davisson
- House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 45, nays 5
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Senators Crider and Leising added as coauthors
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators Becker, Breaux, Ruckelshaus added as coauthors
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Grooms added as coauthor
- Senator Ford Jon added as third author
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as second author
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Zay