+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 157
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 372: yeas 46, nays 0
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 92, nays 3
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Smaltz added as cosponsor
- Representative Pressel removed as cosponsor
- Representative Pressel added as sponsor
- Representative Smaltz removed as sponsor
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Pressel, Siegrist and Klinker
- House sponsor: Representative Smaltz
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 48, nays 0
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Taylor G and Randolph added as coauthors
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added as third author
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as second author
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
- Authored by Senator Bohacek
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor