+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representatives Brown, C. and Niezgodski added as cosponsors
- Representative Brown, T. added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 43, nays 7
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Miller, Pat added as third author
- Amendment #11 (Miller Patricia) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kenley added as second author
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Authored by Senator Broden