+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Representative Pressel
- House sponsor: Representative Negele
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Merritt added as second author
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
- Authored by Senator Bohacek