+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Pierce
- House sponsor: Representative Torr
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 40, nays 10
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kenley added as second author
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Authored by Senator Stoops
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor