+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 87
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 370: yeas 26, nays 20
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
- Senator Houchin removed as second author
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 91, nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Alting and Crider added as coauthors
- Cosponsor: Representative Pressel
- House sponsor: Representative Negele
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 46, nays 0
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Eckerty and Crane added as coauthors
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Houchin added as second author
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
- Authored by Senator Bohacek