+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 91
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 92, nays 0
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as third author
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as second author
- Cosponsor: Representative Stemler
- House sponsor: Representative Clere
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 8: yeas 47, nays 0
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
- Authored by Senator Grooms