+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 149
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 434: yeas 28 and nays 20
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Withdraw Dissent: prevailed
- Motion to Rescind Dissent: prevailed
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Representative T. Brown added as advisor
- Representative Candelaria Reardon added as conferee
- Representative Koch added as advisor
- Representative Torr added as advisor
- Representative Pryor added as advisor
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Kenley added as advisor
- Senator Pete Miller added as conferee
- Senator Hume added as conferee
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senator Stoops added as advisor
- Senator Walker added as advisor
- Senator Smith added as advisor
- Senator Hershman added as advisor
- Senator Hume removed as conferee
- Senator Stoops removed as advisor
- Senator Stoops added as conferee
- Senator Hume added as advisor
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted; bill passed: Roll Call 373: yeas 71 and nays 27
- SB 118 Amendment #4 (Brown, T.), prevailed.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Battles added as cosponsor.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative Braun added as cosponsor.
- Representative T. Brown added sponsor.
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 102: yeas 48 and nays 0
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as coauthor.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Smith added as third author.
- Senator Walker added as second author.
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Pete Miller.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor