+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Law 49
- Signed by the Governor
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 349: yeas 47, nays 0
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 82, nays 13
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz added as coauthor
- Senator Houchin added as coauthor
- Senator Messmer added as second author
- Cosponsors: Representatives Morris, Miller and VanNatter
- House sponsor: Representative DeVon
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
- Authored by Senator Kruse