+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Representative Cook
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 95: yeas 41, nays 8
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reread second time: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Merritt added as second author
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Ford added as third author
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
- Authored by Senator Bohacek