+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 9
- Signed by the Governor
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 92, nays 0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
- Senator Glick added as second author
- Cosponsor: Representative Wright
- House sponsor: Representative Lehe
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Authored by Senator Leising