+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 1
- Signed by the Governor
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 223: yeas 38, nays 10
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Ober added as cosponsor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Representative Forestal added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 83, nays 10
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Siegrist
- House sponsor: Representative Smaltz
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 39, nays 10
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
- Authored by Senator Alting