+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House;
- Representative Cook removed as advisor
- Representative Smith V removed as conferee
- Representative Cook added as conferee
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Hershman added as conferee
- Senator Lanane removed as conferee
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate;
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees appointed: McMillin and Smith V
- House Advisors appointed: Behning, Cook, McNamara, Austin, Errington and Moed
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Kenley, Breaux, Rogers, Kruse and Yoder
- Senate Conferees appointed: Holdman and Lanane
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Wesco added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #9 (Smith V) failed;
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #14 (Smith M) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed;
- Amendment #8 (Smith V) failed;
- Amendment #6 (Smith V) failed;
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
- Representative McMillin added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Hershman added as second author
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 35(c); technical corrections
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment #9 (Lanane) failed;
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #10 (Lanane) failed;
- Amendment #8 (Lanane) failed;
- Amendment #14 (Broden) failed;
- Amendment #12 (Broden) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Lanane) failed;
- Amendment #7 (Lanane) failed;
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Holdman
+ − Amendments (15)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor