+ − Summary
+ − Actions (37)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Law 1
- Signed by the Governor
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 99: yeas 39, nays 7
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 72, nays 21
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #4 (Nisly) failed; Roll Call 97: yeas 3, nays 90
- Amendment #7 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 96: yeas 29, nays 62
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 25: yeas 40, nays 8
- House sponsor: Representative Torr
- Cosponsors: Representatives Lehman, Jeter C, Young J
- Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
- Senators Niemeyer, Grooms, Boots, Perfect added as coauthors
- Senator Tomes added as coauthor
- Senator Raatz added as coauthor
- Referred to the House
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senators Doriot, Baldwin S, Crider, Holdman added as coauthors
- Senators Charbonneau, Alting, Gaskill, Garten, Buck, Bassler added as coauthors
- Amendment #2 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 15: yeas 11, nays 38
- Amendment #3 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Freeman added as coauthor
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
- Senator Houchin added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as coauthor
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senators Buchanan and Rogers added as coauthors
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Coauthored by Senator Zay
- Authored by Senators Messmer, Koch, Brown L