+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 142
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 533: yeas 93, nays 0
- Motion to concur filed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 410: yeas 43, nays 5
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Ford Jon) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Crider added as second sponsor
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 250: yeas 94, nays 3
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Porter) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Pryor) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #5 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Morris, Hamilton, Deal added as coauthors
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
- Authored by Representative Eberhart