+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 34
- Signed by the Governor
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 385: yeas 42, nays 6
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Stoops and Taylor G
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 94, nays 0
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Representatives Kirchhofer and Macer added as coauthors
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Coauthored by Representative Clere
- Authored by Representative Summers