+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Brown T, Cherry and Porter
- House conferees appointed: Huston and DeLaney
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Rogers, Breaux and Holdman
- Senate conferees appointed: Mishler and Niezgodski
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 445: yeas 48, nays 0
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Cosponsor: Senator Holdman
- Senate sponsors: Senators Mishler, Niezgodski and Tallian
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 98, nays 0
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Coauthored by Representatives Porter, DeLaney and Brown T
- Authored by Representative Huston
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor