+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Young M and Randolph Lonnie M
- Senate conferees appointed: Koch and Lanane
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 501: yeas 48, nays 1
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: without recommendation, adopted
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Steuerwald, DeLaney, Torr added as coauthors
- Senate sponsors: Senators Koch and Young M
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 265: yeas 97, nays 0
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Young J) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Authored by Representative Young J
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor