+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 290
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Forestal removed as conferee
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops removed as conferee
- Senator Crider removed as advisor
- Senator Crider added as conferee
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- Representative Soliday removed as House advisor
- Representative Soliday added as conferee
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 643: yeas 86, nays 12
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 583: yeas 43, nays 6
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- House conferees appointed: Smaltz and Forestal
- House advisors appointed: Soliday, Stemler and DeLaney
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate conferee appointed: Kruse and Stoops
- Senate advisors appointed: Wyss, Randolph and Crider
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 367: yeas 49 and nays 0
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Wyss
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 98, nays 1
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
- Coauthored by Representative Soliday
- Authored by Representative Smaltz
+ − Amendment
House Amendment 1579-D
Passed