+ − Summary
+ − Actions (31)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Public Law 218
- Signed by the Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 441: yeas 63, nays 25
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz added as cosponsor
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
- Senator Buck added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 363: yeas 36, nays 14
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 329: yeas 12, nays 35
- Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 330: yeas 12, nays 35
- Amendment #4 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 332: yeas 11, nays 37
- Amendment #3 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 331: yeas 10, nays 37
- Amendment #5 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 333: yeas 9, nays 39
- Amendment #6 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 334: yeas 11, nays 37
- Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Gaskill added as cosponsor
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Houchin, Rogers
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 67, nays 29
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Coauthored by Representatives King and Davis
- Authored by Representative Mayfield