+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Veto overridden by the Senate; Roll Call 2: yeas 34, nays 12
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Veto overridden by the House; Roll Call 2: yeas 68, nays 23
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 582: yeas 48, nays 1
- Rules suspended
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 642: yeas 98, nays 0
- Rules suspended
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Skinner, Buck and Walker
- Senate conferee appointed: Hershman and Broden
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: T. Brown, Slager, Pryor, Klinker and Stemler
- House conferees appointed: Turner and Porter
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 450: yeas 47 and nays 3
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 1 (Hume), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Broden added as cosponsor
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Hershman
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 92, nays 0
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Koch added as coauthor
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Authored by Representative Turner
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 1546-1
Passed
House Amendment 1546-D
Passed