+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 179
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 498: yeas 48, nays 0
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Becker
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 93, nays 0
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Shackleford added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Kirchhofer