+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 463: yeas 63, nays 27
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 402: yeas 44, nays 3
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Bray, Merritt and Lanane
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 62, nays 25
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Representatives GiaQuinta, Engleman, Mahan added as coauthors
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Authored by Representative Richardson