+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 292
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 547: yeas 76, nays 0
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 309: yeas 35 and nays 11
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment 1 (Leising), prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Eckerty added as cosponsor
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Leising and Charbonneau
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 88, nays 2
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Errington added as coauthor
- Representative Lehman removed as coauthor
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
- Coauthored by Representatives Ober, Smaltz and Lehman
- Authored by Representative Zent