+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: rejected by the Senate; Roll Call 624: yeas 19, nays 30
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 621: yeas 60, nays 30
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Rogers and Breaux
- Senate conferees appointed: Bohacek and Lanane
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Burton, Stutzman, Fleming and Hamilton
- House conferees appointed: Clere and Summers
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 494: yeas 26, nays 22
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Burton added as coauthor
- Senate sponsors: Senators Bohacek, Ford J.D. and Breaux
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 291: yeas 82, nays 14
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
- Coauthored by Representatives Clere and Fleming
- Authored by Representative Summers