+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 135
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 521: yeas 48, nays 0
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 581: yeas 61, nays 35
- Rules suspended
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisor appointed: Holdman and Rogers
- Senate conferee appointed: Charbonneau and Arnold
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Soliday and Forestal
- House conferees appointed: Slager and V. Smith
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 400: yeas 48 and nays 0
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Representative V. Smith added as coauthor
- Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Holdman
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 99, nays 0
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 1 (Slager), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Lehman added as coauthor
- Representative Soliday removed as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Bacon added as coauthor
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
- Coauthored by Representative Soliday
- Authored by Representative Slager
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment 1481-1
Passed
House Amendment 1481-D
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
April 24, 2013: Roll Call No. 521
April 24, 2013: Roll Call No. 581
April 8, 2013: Roll Call No. 400
April 2, 2013: Roll Call No. 7976
February 5, 2013: Roll Call No. 82
January 31, 2013: Roll Call No. 7748
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor