+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 114
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 525: yeas 92, nays 0
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 366: yeas 49 and nays 0
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Pat Miller
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 94, nays 0
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Moed added as coauthor
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Coauthored by Representatives Kubacki and Morris
- Authored by Representative Davisson
+ − Amendment
House Amendment 1465-C
Filed