+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 113
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 523: yeas 92, nays 0
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Leising added as cosponsor
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 323: yeas 47 and nays 0
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Cosponsor: Senator Taylor
- Senate sponsors: Senators Grooms, Banks and Walker
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 94, nays 2
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Coauthored by Representatives Kubacki, Austin and Frizzell
- Authored by Representative Davisson
+ − Amendment
House Amendment 1464-C
Filed
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2013: Roll Call No. 523
March 26, 2013: Roll Call No. 323
March 21, 2013: Roll Call No. 7910
February 11, 2013: Roll Call No. 100
February 4, 2013: Roll Call No. 7764
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor