+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Grooms and R. Young
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 57, nays 38
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 1 (Truitt), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Representative Davisson added as coauthor
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
- Authored by Representative Rhoads
+ − Amendment
House Amendment 1433-1
Passed