+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 286
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Skinner removed as conferee
- Senator Rogers removed as conferee
- Senator Skinner added as conferee
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Representative V. Smith removed as conferee
- Representative Thompson added as conferee
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Skinner removed as advisor
- Senate conferee appointed: Yoder
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 581: yeas 34, nays 15
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 658: yeas 53, nays 45
- House consideration of CCR-1: withdrawn
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Broden, Kenley and Skinner
- Senate conferee appointed: Schneider and Rogers
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- House conferees appointed: Rhoads and V. Smith
- House advisors appointed: Behning, Huston, Battles, Errington, VanDenburgh and Moed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 442: yeas 37 and nays 13
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c) technical corrections.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 5 (Kenley), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment 2 (Rogers), prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment 4 (Kenley), prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Banks added as cosponsor
- Amendment 7 (Kruse), prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Banks removed as second sponsor
- Senator Schneider removed as cosponsor
- Senator Schneider added as second sponsor
- Amendment 8 (Kruse), prevailed; voice vote
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Schneider added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 65, nays 33
- Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Banks
- Referred to the Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 5 (Kersey), failed; Roll Call 89: yeas 36, nays 62
- Amendment 2 (Rhoads), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Coauthored by Representative Behning
- Authored by Representative Rhoads
+ − Amendments (14)
Senate Amendment 1427-8
Passed
Senate Amendment 1427-7
Passed
Senate Amendment 1427-3
Filed
Senate Amendment 1427-6
Filed
Senate Amendment 1427-4
Passed
Senate Amendment 1427-5
Passed
House Amendment 1427-D
Filed
House Amendment 1427-5
Passed
House Amendment 1427-4
Filed
Senate Amendment 1427-2
Passed
Senate Amendment 1427-1
Passed
House Amendment 1427-3
Filed
House Amendment 1427-2
Passed
House Amendment 1427-1
Filed