+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 192
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 415: yeas 71, nays 25
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 421: yeas 44, nays 4
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Kruse and Melton
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Behning and Austin
- House advisors appointed: Cook, Clere and Smith V
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Raatz, Mrvan, Zay and Spartz
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 336: yeas 49, nays 0
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #4 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Raatz
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 84, nays 5
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #5 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (DeVon) prevailed; Roll Call 142: yeas 73, nays 12
- Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 143: yeas 21, nays 62
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Austin added as coauthor
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Cook added as coauthor
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Clere added as coauthor
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Authored by Representative Behning