+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as third sponsor
- Senator Holdman added as second sponsor
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Bray
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 71, nays 20
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Stemler and Mayfield added as coauthors
- Amendment #1 (Wesco) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
- Coauthored by Representative Smaltz
- Authored by Representative Wesco