+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 150
- Signed by the Governor
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 362: yeas 81, nays 0
- Motion to concur filed
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 273: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Bray
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 92, nays 0
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Young J added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Authored by Representative Mayfield