+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public Law 27
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Sandlin added as second sponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Representative Bauer added as coauthor
- Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 94, nays 0
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Representative Klinker added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
- Authored by Representative Wolkins