+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 190
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse removed as advisor
- Senator Melton removed as conferee
- Senator Kruse added as conferee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 414: yeas 36, nays 11
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 407: yeas 73, nays 25
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Stoops and Zay
- Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Cook, Jordan and Errington
- House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 41, nays 9
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 112: yeas 86, nays 5
- Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Kruse and Leising
- Representative Ziemke added as coauthor
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #5 (DeLaney) prevailed; Roll Call 72: yeas 91, nays 0
- Amendment #2 (Smith V) prevailed; Roll Call 71: yeas 93, nays 0
- Amendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Goodin added as coauthor
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Authored by Representative Behning