+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 20
- Signed by the Governor
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators Tomes and Crane added as cosponsors
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Glick added as third sponsor
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Kenley and Raatz
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 95, nays 0
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Representatives Arnold, Cook, Austin added as coauthors
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Authored by Representative McNamara