+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 419: yeas 49, nays 1
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 445: yeas 87, nays 9
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Kruse, Mrvan and Yoder
- Senate Conferees appointed: Miller Pete and Stoops
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Cook, Huston and Smith V
- House Conferees appointed: Behning and Moed
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 310: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Stoops) failed; Roll Call 239: yeas 11, nays 39
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as third sponsor
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Senator Taylor added as second sponsor
- Senator Miller, Pete added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 86, nays 8
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Moed added as coauthor
- Amendment #5 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 90: yeas 27, nays 63
- Amendment #3 (Smith V) prevailed; Roll Call 89: yeas 90, nays 0
- Amendment #6 (Errington) failed; Roll Call 88: yeas 27, nays 64
- Amendment #2 (Pierce) motion withdrawn voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Austin) prevailed; Roll Call 87: yeas 88, nays 0
- Amendment #7 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 86: yeas 29, nays 61
- Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 85: yeas 27, nays 63
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Authored by Representative Behning
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor