+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 284
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 545: yeas 66, nays 13
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 440: yeas 50 and nays 0
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 6 (Steele), prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment 8 (Mishler), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 70, nays 24
- Cosponsor: Senator Tallian
- Referred to the Senate
- Senate sponsors: Senators Kenley, Hershman and Broden
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 5 (Thompson), failed; voice vote
- Amendment 7 (Messmer), failed; Division of the House: yeas 40, nays 46
- Amendment 6 (Mayfield), failed; Roll Call 181: yeas 34, nays 59
- Amendment 4 (Mayfield), failed; Roll Call 180: yeas 33, nays 63
- Amendment 3 (Mayfield), failed; Roll Call 179: yeas 30, nays 65
- Amendment 1 (Pryor), prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment 8 (McMillin), prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment 2 (Friend), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Representative DeLaney added as coauthor
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Coauthored by Representatives Richardson and Stemler
- Authored by Representative Steuerwald
+ − Amendments (17)
Senate Amendment 1393-7
Filed
Senate Amendment 1393-8
Passed
Senate Amendment 1393-5
Filed
Senate Amendment 1393-6
Passed
House Amendment 1393-C
Filed
Senate Amendment 1393-3
Filed
Senate Amendment 1393-2
Filed
Senate Amendment 1393-1
Filed
Senate Amendment 1393-4
Filed
House Amendment 1393-6
Filed
House Amendment 1393-7
Filed
House Amendment 1393-8
Passed
House Amendment 1393-5
Filed
House Amendment 1393-4
Filed
House Amendment 1393-3
Filed
House Amendment 1393-2
Passed
House Amendment 1393-1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
April 17, 2013: Roll Call No. 545
April 10, 2013: Roll Call No. 440
April 4, 2013: Roll Call No. 7981
March 28, 2013: Roll Call No. 7960
February 25, 2013: Roll Call No. 226
February 20, 2013: Roll Call No. 181
February 20, 2013: Roll Call No. 180
February 20, 2013: Roll Call No. 179
February 18, 2013: Roll Call No. 7880
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor