+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public Law 131
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 336: yeas 79, nays 0
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators Leising, Buck, Rogers added as cosponsors
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 318: yeas 48, nays 0
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as cosponsor
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Busch
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 92, nays 0
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Representative Jackson added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Representative Mayfield added as coauthor
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Smaltz